Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB68 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 6, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis May 29, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 29, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 7, 2023