Senate | 05/12/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |