Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB696 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 04/24/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West S.B. No. 696
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Higher Education;
 April 24, 2023, reported favorably from Committee on Education by
 the following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 0; April 24, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to student buildings fees at The University of Texas at
 Dallas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 54.531, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.531.  STUDENT UNION BUILDINGS [BUILDING] FEES; THE
 UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT DALLAS.
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.531, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The board of regents of The University of Texas System
 may levy a student union fee, not to exceed $100 [$60] per student
 for each regular semester and not to exceed $50 [$40] per student
 for each term of the summer session, for the sole purpose of
 financing, constructing, operating, maintaining, and improving [a]
 student union buildings [building] for The University of Texas at
 Dallas.
 (a-1)  The amount of the fee levied under this section may
 not be increased to an amount that exceeds by 10 percent or more the
 amount of the fee levied during the preceding academic year[;
 provided, however, that the fee may not be increased above $40 per
 student for each regular semester and $26.67 per student for each
 term of the summer session] unless the increase is approved by a
 majority vote of [those] students enrolled at the university
 participating in a general student election held for that purpose.
 (a-2)  The fee [fees herein] authorized to be levied under
 this section is [are] in addition to any use or service fee [now or
 hereafter] authorized to be levied.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 54.5312, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.5312.  STUDENT SERVICES BUILDINGS [BUILDING] FEE;
 THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT DALLAS.
 SECTION 4.  Section 54.5312(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The board of regents of The University of Texas System
 may impose on each student enrolled at The University of Texas at
 Dallas a student services buildings [building] fee for the sole
 purpose of financing, constructing, operating, maintaining, and
 improving [a] student services buildings [building] at the
 university.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply
 beginning with fees imposed for the 2024 fall semester.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *