Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB712 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/29/2023 9:00 am
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 11 2023 8:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Referred to Energy Resources: May 3 2023 4:20PM