Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB718 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/24/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Introduced
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 24 2023 4:04PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 24 2023 4:04PM
04/26/2023 10:30 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Reported favorably as substituted
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/09/2023 9:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 03/30/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Mar 30 2023 12:19PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/09/2023 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .