Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB798 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 798


 AN ACT
 relating to the certification requirements for a public school
 counselor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.0462 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0462.  QUALIFICATIONS FOR CERTIFICATION AS SCHOOL
 COUNSELOR. The qualifications for certification as a school
 counselor may not include a requirement that a candidate for
 certification have experience as a classroom teacher.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as possible after the effective date of
 this Act but not later than January 1, 2024, the State Board for
 Educator Certification shall propose any rules necessary to
 implement Section 21.0462, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 798 passed the Senate on
 April 5, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 24, Nays 7.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 798 passed the House on
 May 17, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 91, Nays 52,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor