Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB801 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 7, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 6, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill March 16, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 13, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis May 29, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 29, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 8, 2023