Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB801 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 801


 AN ACT
 relating to an instrument that names a trust as a party.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 114, Property Code, is
 amended by adding Section 114.087 to read as follows:
 Sec. 114.087.  INSTRUMENT NAMING TRUST AS PARTY. (a)  The
 trustee of a trust is considered for all purposes to be the named
 party to an instrument that names the trust as a party to the
 instrument in any capacity, unless the trust is a legal entity under
 state law.
 (b)  Subsection (a) is effective as of the effective date of
 the original instrument.
 (c)  The trustee of a trust that is the named party to a
 recorded instrument may be, but is not required to be, identified by
 a correction instrument under Section 5.028.
 (d)  A document purporting to be a certification of trust
 under Section 114.086 that is recorded in the county in which real
 property of the trust is located is presumed to correctly identify
 the trust and the trustee and may be relied upon by a good faith
 purchaser or lender for value.
 SECTION 2.  Section 5.028(a), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A person who has personal knowledge of facts relevant to
 the correction of a recorded original instrument of conveyance may
 prepare or execute a correction instrument to make a nonmaterial
 change that results from a clerical error, including:
 (1)  a correction of an inaccurate or incorrect element
 in a legal description, such as a distance, angle, direction,
 bearing or chord, a reference to a plat or other plat information, a
 lot or block number, a unit, building designation, or section
 number, an appurtenant easement, a township name or number, a
 municipality, county, or state name, a range number or meridian, a
 certified survey map number, or a subdivision or condominium name;
 or
 (2)  an addition, correction, or clarification of:
 (A)  a party's name, including the spelling of a
 name, a first or middle name or initial, a suffix, an alternate name
 by which a party is known, the identity of the trustee of a trust
 named as party, or a description of an entity as a corporation,
 company, or other type of organization;
 (B)  a party's marital status;
 (C)  the date on which the conveyance was
 executed;
 (D)  the recording data for an instrument
 referenced in the correction instrument; or
 (E)  a fact relating to the acknowledgment or
 authentication.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to an
 instrument executed on, before, or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 801 passed the Senate on
 March 16, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 17, 2023, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 801 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 12, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 2, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor