E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5202
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2053
|
Journal Page: 5201
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5201
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5201
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5202
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2027
|
Journal Page: 5127
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5127
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5127
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4379
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 4379
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4379
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2053
|
Journal Page: 5201
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5201
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 819
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 849
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 381
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 286
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|