Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB812 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 27, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 29, 2023
Bill May 24, 2023
Bill May 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 29, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 1, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023