E | 05/05/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/05/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1609 | |
E | 04/27/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1401 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2190 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1317 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1940 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | RV#444 | Journal Page: 1939 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1939 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1939 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1886 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1886 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 669 | Journal Page: 1886 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1928 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 876 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 541 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |