Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB838 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 21, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 25, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023