E | 05/29/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/29/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
E | 05/17/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2066 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4550 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2010 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1988 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4386 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 1946 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1945 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3865 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1486 | Journal Page: 3865 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3865 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3865 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3768 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3768 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 3519 | Journal Page: 3768 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2041 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2041 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1835 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1184 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1098 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1098 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1098 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1098 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1098 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1098 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1098 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2041 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 290 | |
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |