E
|
05/29/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
E
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4550
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2010
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4386
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1485
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3768
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Buckley
|
Journal Page: 3768
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3768
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2238
|
Journal Page: 3768
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3713
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3768
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1926
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Flores
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Flores
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2041
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 292
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 297
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|