1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 876 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the licensing and regulation of dog and cat breeders; |
---|
6 | 6 | | expanding the applicability of an occupational license. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 802.002(8), Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
9 | 9 | | to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (8) "Dog or cat breeder" means a person who possesses |
---|
11 | 11 | | five [11] or more adult intact female animals and is engaged in the |
---|
12 | 12 | | business of breeding those animals for direct or indirect sale or |
---|
13 | 13 | | for exchange in return for consideration [and who sells or |
---|
14 | 14 | | exchanges, or offers to sell or exchange, not fewer than 20 animals |
---|
15 | 15 | | in a calendar year]. |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 2. Sections 802.005(a) and (b), Occupations Code, |
---|
17 | 17 | | are amended to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (a) This section applies only to a dog bred with the intent |
---|
19 | 19 | | that it be used primarily for: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) herding livestock, as defined by Section 1.003, |
---|
21 | 21 | | Agriculture Code, or other agricultural uses; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) hunting, including tracking, chasing, pointing, |
---|
23 | 23 | | flushing, or retrieving game; or |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) competing in field trials, hunting tests, breed or |
---|
25 | 25 | | conformation shows, or similar organized performance events. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (b) This chapter does not apply to a person to the extent the |
---|
27 | 27 | | person breeds dogs described by Subsection (a) for a [personal] use |
---|
28 | 28 | | described by Subsection (a). A person described by this subsection |
---|
29 | 29 | | may conduct direct or indirect sales or exchanges in return for |
---|
30 | 30 | | consideration of dogs described by Subsection (a). |
---|
31 | 31 | | SECTION 3. As soon as practicable after the effective date |
---|
32 | 32 | | of this Act, the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation shall |
---|
33 | 33 | | prescribe the forms and procedures necessary to implement the |
---|
34 | 34 | | changes in law made by this Act. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 4. Notwithstanding Section 802.002(8), Occupations |
---|
36 | 36 | | Code, as amended by this Act, a dog or cat breeder who possesses |
---|
37 | 37 | | five or more but fewer than 11 adult intact female animals and is |
---|
38 | 38 | | engaged in the business of breeding those animals for direct or |
---|
39 | 39 | | indirect sale or for exchange in return for consideration is not |
---|
40 | 40 | | required to hold a license under Chapter 802, Occupations Code, to |
---|
41 | 41 | | act as a dog or cat breeder before January 1, 2024. |
---|
42 | 42 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
43 | 43 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
44 | 44 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
45 | 45 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 876 passed the Senate on |
---|
46 | 46 | | April 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 22, Nays 8; and that |
---|
47 | 47 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 16, 2023, by the |
---|
48 | 48 | | following vote: Yeas 23, Nays 8. |
---|
49 | 49 | | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | 50 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
51 | 51 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 876 passed the House, with |
---|
52 | 52 | | amendment, on May 11, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 119, |
---|
53 | 53 | | Nays 23, one present not voting. |
---|
54 | 54 | | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | 55 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
56 | 56 | | Approved: |
---|
57 | 57 | | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | 58 | | Date |
---|
59 | 59 | | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | 60 | | Governor |
---|