Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB888 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 9, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 30, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 17, 2023