Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB891 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/08/2023 9:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select: May 12 2023 12:02AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/08/2023 S Left pending in committee