House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 846
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 543
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Johnson
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 506
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 383
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|