Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB896 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 7, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 12, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 13, 2023
Witness List

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 8, 2023