Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB896 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/13/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 896
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2023; March 1, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 13, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 13, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the automatic stay of proceedings pending an
 interlocutory appeal of a denial of a motion to dismiss in an action
 involving the exercise of certain constitutional rights.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.014, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  A denial of a motion to dismiss described by
 Subsection (a)(12) is not subject to the automatic stay under
 Subsection (b) if the order denying the motion states that the
 motion was:
 (1)  denied as not timely filed under Section
 27.003(b);
 (2)  determined to be frivolous or solely intended to
 delay under Section 27.009(b); or
 (3)  denied because the action is exempt under Section
 27.010(a).
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an action filed on or after the effective date of this Act.  An
 action filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law applicable to the action immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *