Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB902 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 14, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023