LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB921
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB921
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB921
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/13/2023
10:30 am
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
Senate Chamber
SB825
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB221
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/18/2023 H Postponed
SB747
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB921
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Referred to Elections: Apr 3 2023 2:31PM
SB15
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB175
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 13 2023 1:37PM
SB1052
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB924
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23