House | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 4312 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4312 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3858 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1726 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1745 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1596 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4312 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 307 | |
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |