E | 05/29/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/29/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
E | 05/17/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2066 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4550 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2010 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1951 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4330 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Record vote | RV#1720 | Journal Page: 4329 |
House | 05/16/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4329 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4329 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4253 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4253 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1720 | Journal Page: 4329 |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4329 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4329 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4253 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 903 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 903 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 902 |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 766 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 506 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |