Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR18

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 15, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, February 21, 2023.

Impact

The passing of SCR18 enables the legislature to manage its schedule more flexibly. By formally allowing adjournment beyond the typical three-day limit without the necessity of additional consent from the opposite house, the resolution removes potential procedural roadblocks. This change is pivotal for enhancing the legislative process as it facilitates necessary breaks for lawmakers, thereby potentially leading to more thorough deliberation on legislative matters upon their return.

Summary

Senate Concurrent Resolution 18 (SCR18) was introduced to grant the Texas legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days, specifically from February 15, 2023, to February 21, 2023. This resolution is a procedural measure aimed at allowing both houses of the legislature to ensure they can take necessary time away from formal sessions while adhering to state constitutional requirements. SCR18 reflects the legislative body's adherence to established norms and practices that foster efficiency during its sessions.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR18 appeared to be largely supportive among legislators. The resolution was adopted with minimal opposition, evident from the voting results which recorded a substantial majority in favor in both the Senate (31-0) and the House (146-2). This overwhelming support signifies a recognition among members of the importance of maintaining an adaptable legislative schedule, and that they viewed the resolution as beneficial for ensuring governmental functions remain efficient.

Contention

While SCR18 did not appear to provoke significant contention, the discussions surrounding it highlighted the balance between legislative efficiency and constitutional requirements. The notable point of contention could arise in contexts where extended adjournments affect the timely addressing of urgent legislative matters. However, given the substantial support evidenced in the voting outcomes, it seems the legislature found common ground on the importance of allowing more flexible adjournments within the formal structure of state governance.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.