Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 22, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, February 28, 2023.

Impact

The adoption of SCR 20 is primarily procedural, allowing both houses of the legislature to have flexibility in their schedules without violating constitutional rules. By adopting this resolution, both legislative bodies ensure that they can manage their legislative business efficiently, particularly given the constraints of the state constitution. The unanimous support from the Senate, with a vote of 29 to 0, as well as strong support in the House, indicates a general consensus in favor of maintaining legislative efficiency and planning.

Summary

Senate Concurrent Resolution 20, introduced by Senator Whitmire, seeks to grant permission for the Texas Legislature to adjourn for more than three days during the specified period from February 22 to February 28, 2023. This resolution is in accordance with Section 17 of Article III of the Texas Constitution, which stipulates that neither house may adjourn for more than three days without the consent of the other house. The resolution was explained and moved for adoption by Senator Whitmire, emphasizing the necessity for the legislature's extended break during this period.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR 20 appears to be overwhelmingly positive, as evidenced by the votes in favor from both chambers. The resolution was adopted without significant opposition, reflecting a collaborative atmosphere among legislators. The quick explanations and motions for adoption suggest a mutual understanding and agreement on the need for this flexibility during the current legislative session.

Contention

While SCR 20 does not appear to have sparked significant points of contention, it serves as a reminder of the constitutional requirements for legislative adjournment. Although the vote was largely unanimous, the presence of three nays in the House highlights that even generally supported resolutions can occasionally face opposition, even if minimal. Overall, the focus of the resolution is practical and ensures that legislative processes are not hindered by procedural constraints.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.