Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 1, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 6, 2023.

Impact

The passage of SCR21 has implications for legislative procedure in Texas. By allowing both houses to adjourn for a longer period, lawmakers are afforded the opportunity to regroup, analyze ongoing discussions, or negotiate further on pending legislation. This resolution illustrates a practical approach to legislative scheduling, enabling members to better allocate their time for critical issues while maintaining the integrity of their duties as representatives. The adoption of SCR21 enables smoother transitions during busy legislative sessions and may contribute to more thorough discussions.

Summary

SCR21, a Senate Concurrent Resolution, was introduced to grant permission for the Texas Legislature to adjourn for more than three days during a specified period from March 1, 2023, to March 6, 2023. The rationale behind this resolution is rooted in the Texas Constitution, which restricts each house from adjourning for more than three days without mutual consent. By adopting this resolution, the legislature preserves its operational flexibility and ensures that it can manage its sessions effectively, particularly in light of legislative business that may require extended deliberation or breaks for internal discussions.

Sentiment

General sentiment surrounding SCR21 appears to have been positive, reflecting a consensus among legislators regarding the need for flexibility in their schedules. The resolution received overwhelming support during voting, indicating that members view the adjournment extension as beneficial to legislative proceedings. Such unanimous backing may highlight a collaborative spirit and a collective understanding of the challenges posed by tight legislative timelines.

Contention

While SCR21 was successfully adopted with minimal opposition—only five nays were recorded in the House and none in the Senate—this resolution does not appear to have faced significant contention during discussions. The nature of the resolution primarily involves procedural elements rather than substantive policy debates, which typically elicit more divisive opinions. However, the context of any future legislative actions following the adjournment could lead to potential discussions on how extended breaks may affect legislative momentum and public engagement with ongoing issues.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.