LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SCR25
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SCR25
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SCR25
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/02/2023
8:30 am
Business & Commerce Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.012
HB1074
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1550
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1706
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1748
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1900
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1901
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB833
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB2627
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on adoption of const. amendment
SCR25
Introduced
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 12 2023 12:02AM
SJR93
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/30/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State