E | 05/23/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2543 | |
E | 05/11/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1817 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4045 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1751 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1708 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3500 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1306 | Journal Page: 3500 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3500 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3500 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 986 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |