House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |