House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 702 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 702 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |