E | 04/28/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1401 | |
E | 04/18/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1042 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 976 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 974 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 905 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |