E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3310 | |
E | 05/29/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5890 | |
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2966 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2684 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2574 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5157 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Record vote | RV#2032 | Journal Page: 5157 |
House | 05/24/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5157 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5157 | |
House | 05/24/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4609 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2908 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2789 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1460 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1459 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 423 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 398 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 382 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/05/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/05/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |