E | 05/27/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3176 | |
E | 05/16/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1988 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4384 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1929 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1878 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4057 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4057 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 2908 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2789 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |