E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3310 | |
E | 05/29/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/29/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6486 | |
Senate | 05/28/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3197 | |
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2989 | |
Senate | 05/25/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2800 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5313 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5313 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 4826 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4828 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2241 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |