Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR9 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023
Bill
Analysis

House Committee Report

Witness List
Bill

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Bill

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 29, 2023