1 | 1 | | 2023S0004-1 11/30/22 |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Perry S.J.R. No. 27 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A JOINT RESOLUTION |
---|
6 | 6 | | proposing a constitutional amendment creating the Texas |
---|
7 | 7 | | Connectivity Fund for the development of broadband and other |
---|
8 | 8 | | telecommunications services in all areas of the state and |
---|
9 | 9 | | authorizing the appropriation to that fund of a portion of revenue |
---|
10 | 10 | | received from the existing state sales and use taxes on |
---|
11 | 11 | | telecommunications services while not increasing the rate of the |
---|
12 | 12 | | sales and use taxes. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by |
---|
15 | 15 | | adding Section 68 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 68. (a) In this section: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) "Commission" means the Public Utility Commission |
---|
18 | 18 | | of Texas or its successor. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) "Comptroller" means the comptroller of public |
---|
20 | 20 | | accounts of the State of Texas. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (3) "Fund" means the Texas Connectivity Fund. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) The Texas Connectivity Fund is created in the state |
---|
23 | 23 | | treasury and shall be administered by the comptroller as a |
---|
24 | 24 | | revolving fund to provide a method of funding for the development of |
---|
25 | 25 | | telecommunications services, including the construction, |
---|
26 | 26 | | reconstruction, and expansion of telecommunications infrastructure |
---|
27 | 27 | | and services, and the operation of existing telecommunications |
---|
28 | 28 | | infrastructure and services as determined by the comptroller and |
---|
29 | 29 | | the commission in accordance with standards and procedures |
---|
30 | 30 | | established by law. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) Money in the fund may also be used in conjunction with |
---|
32 | 32 | | other funds in accordance with the procedures, standards, and |
---|
33 | 33 | | limitations established by federal law and the laws of this state. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (d) Money dedicated as provided by this section is |
---|
35 | 35 | | appropriated when received by the state, shall be deposited to the |
---|
36 | 36 | | credit of the fund, and may be used as provided by this section and |
---|
37 | 37 | | any laws enacted under this section without further appropriation. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (e) Unless authorized to continue by a two-thirds vote of |
---|
39 | 39 | | the members elected to each house, this section expires on |
---|
40 | 40 | | September 1, 2035. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 2. Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by |
---|
42 | 42 | | adding Section 7-e to read as follows: |
---|
43 | 43 | | Sec. 7-e. (a) Subject to Subsection (b) of this section, |
---|
44 | 44 | | for each state fiscal year, 50 percent of the net revenue received |
---|
45 | 45 | | from the collection of any state taxes imposed on the sale, use, or |
---|
46 | 46 | | other consumption in this state of telecommunications services that |
---|
47 | 47 | | were subject to taxation on January 1, 2023, under Chapter 151, Tax |
---|
48 | 48 | | Code, is automatically appropriated to the Texas Connectivity Fund. |
---|
49 | 49 | | The legislature by general law may provide limitations on the use of |
---|
50 | 50 | | money appropriated under this subsection, with priority given to |
---|
51 | 51 | | funds required by the universal service fund or its successor. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (b) The legislature by adoption of a resolution approved by |
---|
53 | 53 | | a record vote of two-thirds of the members of each house may direct |
---|
54 | 54 | | the comptroller to reduce the amount of money appropriated to the |
---|
55 | 55 | | Texas Connectivity Fund. The comptroller may be directed to make |
---|
56 | 56 | | that reduction only: |
---|
57 | 57 | | (1) in the state fiscal year in which the resolution is |
---|
58 | 58 | | adopted, or in either of the following two state fiscal years; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (2) by an amount that does not result in a reduction of |
---|
60 | 60 | | more than 50 percent of the amount that would otherwise be |
---|
61 | 61 | | appropriated to the Texas Connectivity Fund in the affected state |
---|
62 | 62 | | fiscal year under Subsection (a) of this section. |
---|
63 | 63 | | (c) Money appropriated to the Texas Connectivity Fund under |
---|
64 | 64 | | Subsection (a) of this section may not be considered available for |
---|
65 | 65 | | certification by the comptroller under Section 49a(b), Article III, |
---|
66 | 66 | | of this constitution. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (d) In this section, "telecommunications services" means |
---|
68 | 68 | | the electronic or electrical transmission, conveyance, routing, or |
---|
69 | 69 | | reception of sounds, signals, data, or information utilizing wires, |
---|
70 | 70 | | cable, radio waves, microwaves, satellites, fiber optics, or any |
---|
71 | 71 | | other method now in existence or that may be devised, including |
---|
72 | 72 | | long-distance telephone service. The term does not include: |
---|
73 | 73 | | (1) the storage of data or information for subsequent |
---|
74 | 74 | | retrieval or the processing, or reception and processing, of data |
---|
75 | 75 | | or information intended to change its form or content; |
---|
76 | 76 | | (2) the sale or use of a telephone prepaid calling |
---|
77 | 77 | | card; |
---|
78 | 78 | | (3) Internet access service; or |
---|
79 | 79 | | (4) the portion of the sales price of a pay telephone |
---|
80 | 80 | | coin sent-paid telephone call that is paid by coin. |
---|
81 | 81 | | (e) Unless authorized to continue by a two-thirds vote of |
---|
82 | 82 | | the members elected to each house, this section expires on |
---|
83 | 83 | | September 1, 2035. |
---|
84 | 84 | | SECTION 3. The following temporary provision is added to |
---|
85 | 85 | | the Texas Constitution: |
---|
86 | 86 | | TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies |
---|
87 | 87 | | to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 88th Legislature, |
---|
88 | 88 | | Regular Session, 2023, dedicating a portion of the revenue received |
---|
89 | 89 | | from the existing state sales and use taxes that are imposed on |
---|
90 | 90 | | telecommunications services to the Texas Connectivity Fund to |
---|
91 | 91 | | provide funding for the development of broadband and other |
---|
92 | 92 | | telecommunications services in all areas of the state while not |
---|
93 | 93 | | increasing the rate of the state sales and use taxes. |
---|
94 | 94 | | (b) Section 68, Article III, of this constitution takes |
---|
95 | 95 | | effect September 1, 2025. |
---|
96 | 96 | | (c) Section 7-e, Article VIII, of this constitution takes |
---|
97 | 97 | | effect September 1, 2025, and applies only to state tax revenue |
---|
98 | 98 | | collected on or after that date. |
---|
99 | 99 | | (d) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2026. |
---|
100 | 100 | | SECTION 4. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
101 | 101 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023. |
---|
102 | 102 | | The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the |
---|
103 | 103 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment creating the Texas |
---|
104 | 104 | | Connectivity Fund for the development of broadband and other |
---|
105 | 105 | | telecommunications services in all areas of the state and |
---|
106 | 106 | | authorizing the appropriation to that fund of a portion of revenue |
---|
107 | 107 | | received from the existing state sales and use taxes on |
---|
108 | 108 | | telecommunications services while not increasing the rate of the |
---|
109 | 109 | | sales and use taxes." |
---|