Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR27 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/10/2023

                            2023S0004-1 11/30/22
 By: Perry S.J.R. No. 27


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment creating the Texas
 Connectivity Fund for the development of broadband and other
 telecommunications services in all areas of the state and
 authorizing the appropriation to that fund of a portion of revenue
 received from the existing state sales and use taxes on
 telecommunications services while not increasing the rate of the
 sales and use taxes.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 68 to read as follows:
 Sec. 68.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Public Utility Commission
 of Texas or its successor.
 (2)  "Comptroller" means the comptroller of public
 accounts of the State of Texas.
 (3)  "Fund" means the Texas Connectivity Fund.
 (b)  The Texas Connectivity Fund is created in the state
 treasury and shall be administered by the comptroller as a
 revolving fund to provide a method of funding for the development of
 telecommunications services, including the construction,
 reconstruction, and expansion of telecommunications infrastructure
 and services, and the operation of existing telecommunications
 infrastructure and services as determined by the comptroller and
 the commission in accordance with standards and procedures
 established by law.
 (c)  Money in the fund may also be used in conjunction with
 other funds in accordance with the procedures, standards, and
 limitations established by federal law and the laws of this state.
 (d)  Money dedicated as provided by this section is
 appropriated when received by the state, shall be deposited to the
 credit of the fund, and may be used as provided by this section and
 any laws enacted under this section without further appropriation.
 (e)  Unless authorized to continue by a two-thirds vote of
 the members elected to each house, this section expires on
 September 1, 2035.
 SECTION 2.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-e to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-e.  (a)  Subject to Subsection (b) of this section,
 for each state fiscal year, 50 percent of the net revenue received
 from the collection of any state taxes imposed on the sale, use, or
 other consumption in this state of telecommunications services that
 were subject to taxation on January 1, 2023, under Chapter 151, Tax
 Code, is automatically appropriated to the Texas Connectivity Fund.
 The legislature by general law may provide limitations on the use of
 money appropriated under this subsection, with priority given to
 funds required by the universal service fund or its successor.
 (b)  The legislature by adoption of a resolution approved by
 a record vote of two-thirds of the members of each house may direct
 the comptroller to reduce the amount of money appropriated to the
 Texas Connectivity Fund. The comptroller may be directed to make
 that reduction only:
 (1)  in the state fiscal year in which the resolution is
 adopted, or in either of the following two state fiscal years; and
 (2)  by an amount that does not result in a reduction of
 more than 50 percent of the amount that would otherwise be
 appropriated to the Texas Connectivity Fund in the affected state
 fiscal year under Subsection (a) of this section.
 (c)  Money appropriated to the Texas Connectivity Fund under
 Subsection (a) of this section may not be considered available for
 certification by the comptroller under Section 49a(b), Article III,
 of this constitution.
 (d)  In this section, "telecommunications services" means
 the electronic or electrical transmission, conveyance, routing, or
 reception of sounds, signals, data, or information utilizing wires,
 cable, radio waves, microwaves, satellites, fiber optics, or any
 other method now in existence or that may be devised, including
 long-distance telephone service.  The term does not include:
 (1)  the storage of data or information for subsequent
 retrieval or the processing, or reception and processing, of data
 or information intended to change its form or content;
 (2)  the sale or use of a telephone prepaid calling
 card;
 (3)  Internet access service; or
 (4)  the portion of the sales price of a pay telephone
 coin sent-paid telephone call that is paid by coin.
 (e)  Unless authorized to continue by a two-thirds vote of
 the members elected to each house, this section expires on
 September 1, 2035.
 SECTION 3.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 88th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2023, dedicating a portion of the revenue received
 from the existing state sales and use taxes that are imposed on
 telecommunications services to the Texas Connectivity Fund to
 provide funding for the development of broadband and other
 telecommunications services in all areas of the state while not
 increasing the rate of the state sales and use taxes.
 (b)  Section 68, Article III, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2025.
 (c)  Section 7-e, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2025, and applies only to state tax revenue
 collected on or after that date.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2026.
 SECTION 4.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment creating the Texas
 Connectivity Fund for the development of broadband and other
 telecommunications services in all areas of the state and
 authorizing the appropriation to that fund of a portion of revenue
 received from the existing state sales and use taxes on
 telecommunications services while not increasing the rate of the
 sales and use taxes."