Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR54 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/30/2023

                            By: Middleton S.J.R. No. 54
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2023; March 3, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 30, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; March 30, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 54 By:  Hughes


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit a court from
 issuing an opinion without disclosing the judges who authored the
 opinion.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article V, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 1-b to read as follows:
 Sec. 1-b.  The authorship of an opinion published by a court
 is public information.  A court shall list the authors of any
 opinion published by the court.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment to prohibit a court
 from issuing an opinion without disclosing the judges who authored
 the opinion."
 * * * * *