LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SJR56
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SJR56
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SJR56
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 22, 2023
Compare
Bill
Compare
Analysis
Fiscal Note
Engrossed
Bill
April 20, 2023
Compare
Bill
Compare
Senate Committee Report
Witness List
Analysis
Fiscal Note
Bill
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 17, 2023
Compare
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
April 16, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 12, 2023
Analysis
Analysis
April 12, 2023
Analysis
April 7, 2023