LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SJR57
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SJR57
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SJR57
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/04/2023
8:30 am
Business & Commerce Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.012
SB613
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB814
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB986
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Referred to Business & Industry: Apr 25 2023 5:13PM
SB1119
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB1514
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1639
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1659
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
SB1732
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
SB2040
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SJR57
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 S Left pending in committee