House | 04/06/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1286 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 821 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 820 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Birdwell | Journal Page: 820 |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 820 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 820 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 582 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 432 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 432 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |