E
|
05/30/2023
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6423
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6423
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2904
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2424
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4893
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1945
|
Journal Page: 4892
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 4892
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4892
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3268
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1568
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1440
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Permission to introduce
|
|
Journal Page: 1438
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|