LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SJR93
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SJR93
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SJR93
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
May 1, 2023
Compare
Fiscal Note
Analysis
Bill
Compare
House Committee Report
Bill
Compare
Fiscal Note
Analysis
Witness List
Engrossed
Bill
May 4, 2023
Compare
Bill
Compare
Fiscal Note
Senate Committee Report
Bill
Compare
Witness List
Enrolled
Bill
May 28, 2023
Compare
Bill
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
Analysis
July 12, 2023
Analysis
May 20, 2023
Analysis
May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 1, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
May 20, 2023
Compare
Bill
May 2, 2023
Compare