Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR312 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/15/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 312
 In Memory
 of
 Charles J. Hensley
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life well lived remain to comfort
 the family and friends of Charles J. Hensley of Hawkins, who
 passed away on February 11, 2023, at the age of 85; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Sherman on November 25, 1937, to Gladys
 and Dude Hensley, Charlie Hensley grew up with the companionship
 of two siblings, Benny and Patricia; while in high school, he
 struck up a friendship with the former Sonja Overbey, whom he
 went on to marry on July 26, 1956; during the more than 65 years
 they shared, they were blessed with two sons, Bud and David, as
 well as 8 grandchildren and 10 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, After serving as a member of the Texas Army
 National Guard, Mr. Hensley began his career as a game warden
 with the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department in 1962; he reported
 to his first duty station in Corpus Christi, and his passion for
 his work drove him to excel and climb the ranks within the
 department; over the years, he earned promotions to Dallas
 district supervisor in 1972 and Fort Worth regional director in
 1975, and he was elevated to chief of staff in Austin in 1990; he
 served as director of law enforcement from 1992 until his
 retirement at the rank of colonel, following 34 years with the
 agency; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hensley was a member of the Texas Game Warden
 Association, the Game Warden Peace Officers Association, the
 Iris Society of Austin, and the Hill Country Gardeners Club; a
 man of faith, he was also an ordained Baptist deacon; he shared
 his love of gardening and working on carpentry projects with his
 wife, and he was fond of going on hunting trips with his friends;
 through the years, he and his wife enjoyed hosting gatherings at
 their home with game wardens, neighbors, and members of their
 church congregation; and
 WHEREAS, Charlie Hensley was an esteemed public servant, a
 devoted family man, and a dear friend, and he will forever be
 remembered with admiration and affection by those he leaves
 behind; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Charles J. Hensley
 and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Sonja Hensley; to his sons, Bud Hensley and his wife,
 Jeana, and David Hensley and his wife, Cathy; to his
 grandchildren and great-grandchildren; to his sister, Patricia;
 and to all others who mourn his passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Charlie Hensley.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 15, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate