1 | 1 | | SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 396 |
---|
2 | 2 | | In Memory |
---|
3 | 3 | | of |
---|
4 | 4 | | Thomas Jefferson Payne |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and |
---|
6 | 6 | | commemorates the life of Dr. Thomas Jefferson Payne, who died |
---|
7 | 7 | | March 30, 2023, at the age of 87; and |
---|
8 | 8 | | WHEREAS, The son of James Payne and Vivian Smith Payne, |
---|
9 | 9 | | Thomas Payne was born in Marlin on October 21, 1935; he accepted |
---|
10 | 10 | | his call to the ministry in 1973 and enrolled in the Christian |
---|
11 | 11 | | ministry degree program at the Southern Bible Institute in |
---|
12 | 12 | | Dallas, and he graduated with honors in 1976; he preached his |
---|
13 | 13 | | first sermon at Mount Horeb Missionary Baptist Church in Reagor |
---|
14 | 14 | | Springs on October 7, 1973, and in 1976, he was called to pastor |
---|
15 | 15 | | the Samaria Baptist Church in Kerens, Texas, where he served |
---|
16 | 16 | | through 1981; and |
---|
17 | 17 | | WHEREAS, A distinguished scholar and a devoted spiritual |
---|
18 | 18 | | servant, Thomas further pursued studies in theology at Dallas |
---|
19 | 19 | | Bible College and Dallas Baptist University from 1986 through |
---|
20 | 20 | | 1989; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | WHEREAS, Pastor Payne co-founded the Pearly Gate Baptist |
---|
22 | 22 | | Church on December 17, 1981, and he ministered faithfully to the |
---|
23 | 23 | | physical and spiritual needs of his congregation until his |
---|
24 | 24 | | retirement in 2016; under Pastor Payne's outstanding leadership, |
---|
25 | 25 | | the church grew dramatically from its original congregation of 22 |
---|
26 | 26 | | to its current membership of over 3,000, and it has provided |
---|
27 | 27 | | enlightenment, hope, and support to the Dallas community for more |
---|
28 | 28 | | than 40 years; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | WHEREAS, Dr. Payne had a distinguished 34-year career with |
---|
30 | 30 | | LTV Corporation from 1954 to 1988; he held an honorary doctorate |
---|
31 | 31 | | in humanities from the Southern Bible Institute, and he received |
---|
32 | 32 | | the Dr. Milton K. Curry Jr. Education Award in 2014; a treasured |
---|
33 | 33 | | leader in his community, Dr. Payne served as executive board |
---|
34 | 34 | | treasurer of Southern Bible Institute and as the revival chairman |
---|
35 | 35 | | of the Oak Cliff Baptist Minister's Union; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | WHEREAS, Pastor Payne shared 47 devoted years of marriage |
---|
37 | 37 | | with the late Geraldine Payne; he was blessed once again to find |
---|
38 | 38 | | love with Sandra Fay Buckley, whom he married in 2006; a loving |
---|
39 | 39 | | husband, father, and grandfather, Pastor Payne greatly cherished |
---|
40 | 40 | | his 12 children, his 29 grandchildren, and his 36 |
---|
41 | 41 | | great-grandchildren; and |
---|
42 | 42 | | WHEREAS, A revered spiritual leader and counselor and an |
---|
43 | 43 | | esteemed member of the Dallas community, Dr. Thomas Payne |
---|
44 | 44 | | inspired countless congregates and colleagues as a mentor, |
---|
45 | 45 | | pastor, and friend, and he will long be remembered with deep |
---|
46 | 46 | | respect and admiration by all who were privileged to share in his |
---|
47 | 47 | | life; now, therefore, be it |
---|
48 | 48 | | RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th |
---|
49 | 49 | | Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved |
---|
50 | 50 | | family of Dr. Thomas Jefferson Payne; and, be it further |
---|
51 | 51 | | RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for |
---|
52 | 52 | | his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas |
---|
53 | 53 | | Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in |
---|
54 | 54 | | memory of Dr. Thomas Payne. |
---|
55 | 55 | | West |
---|
56 | 56 | | ________________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | President of the Senate |
---|
58 | 58 | | I hereby certify that the |
---|
59 | 59 | | above Resolution was adopted by |
---|
60 | 60 | | the Senate on April 11, 2023, by a |
---|
61 | 61 | | rising vote. |
---|
62 | 62 | | ________________________________ |
---|
63 | 63 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
64 | 64 | | ________________________________ |
---|
65 | 65 | | Member, Texas Senate |
---|