Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR396 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/12/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 396
 In Memory
 of
 Thomas Jefferson Payne
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Dr. Thomas Jefferson Payne, who died
 March 30, 2023, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, The son of James Payne and Vivian Smith Payne,
 Thomas Payne was born in Marlin on October 21, 1935; he accepted
 his call to the ministry in 1973 and enrolled in the Christian
 ministry degree program at the Southern Bible Institute in
 Dallas, and he graduated with honors in 1976; he preached his
 first sermon at Mount Horeb Missionary Baptist Church in Reagor
 Springs on October 7, 1973, and in 1976, he was called to pastor
 the Samaria Baptist Church in Kerens, Texas, where he served
 through 1981; and
 WHEREAS, A distinguished scholar and a devoted spiritual
 servant, Thomas further pursued studies in theology at Dallas
 Bible College and Dallas Baptist University from 1986 through
 1989; and
 WHEREAS, Pastor Payne co-founded the Pearly Gate Baptist
 Church on December 17, 1981, and he ministered faithfully to the
 physical and spiritual needs of his congregation until his
 retirement in 2016; under Pastor Payne's outstanding leadership,
 the church grew dramatically from its original congregation of 22
 to its current membership of over 3,000, and it has provided
 enlightenment, hope, and support to the Dallas community for more
 than 40 years; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Payne had a distinguished 34-year career with
 LTV Corporation from 1954 to 1988; he held an honorary doctorate
 in humanities from the Southern Bible Institute, and he received
 the Dr. Milton K. Curry Jr. Education Award in 2014; a treasured
 leader in his community, Dr. Payne served as executive board
 treasurer of Southern Bible Institute and as the revival chairman
 of the Oak Cliff Baptist Minister's Union; and
 WHEREAS, Pastor Payne shared 47 devoted years of marriage
 with the late Geraldine Payne; he was blessed once again to find
 love with Sandra Fay Buckley, whom he married in 2006; a loving
 husband, father, and grandfather, Pastor Payne greatly cherished
 his 12 children, his 29 grandchildren, and his 36
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, A revered spiritual leader and counselor and an
 esteemed member of the Dallas community, Dr. Thomas Payne
 inspired countless congregates and colleagues as a mentor,
 pastor, and friend, and he will long be remembered with deep
 respect and admiration by all who were privileged to share in his
 life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Dr. Thomas Jefferson Payne; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Dr. Thomas Payne.
 West
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 11, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate