Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR537 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 537
 In Memory
 of
 Maria Gutierrez
 WHEREAS, A life made rich through meaningful service drew
 to a close with the passing of Maria T. Gutierrez of Willacy
 County on April 15, 2019, at the age of 72; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Eutimio and Teresa Gutierrez,
 Mary Gutierrez was born in Sarita on October 2, 1946, and she grew
 up with the companionship of nine siblings; throughout her life,
 she worked to help and support others, and she was a devoted and
 loyal friend to many; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Gutierrez became city commissioner of
 Raymondville in 1999, and she held that office for 16 years
 before concluding her tenure in 2015; dedicated to her community,
 she was a member of the Raymondville Chamber of Commerce board of
 directors, and she was active in numerous civic organizations,
 including Raymondville Amigos Del Valle, Willacy County Little
 League, Court Appointed Special Advocates, Su Clinica Familiar,
 and the Willacy County Child Welfare Board; in addition, she was
 a former member of the Lower Rio Grande Valley Development
 Council; and
 WHEREAS, On January 1, 2001, Ms. Gutierrez joined the
 Willacy County Emergency Service District Board, and she was
 elected president of the board in 2015; she ably led the
 organization until her passing, and she is being posthumously
 honored with the dedication of its building in her memory; and
 WHEREAS, Through her leadership, generosity, and
 commitment to service, Mary Gutierrez made a positive difference
 in the lives of countless Willacy County residents, and her
 contributions will continue to resonate for years to come; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life and legacy of
 Maria T. Gutierrez; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Mary Gutierrez.
 LaMantia
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 10, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate