Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR652 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 652
 In Memory
 of
 Wayne S. Condie
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will long cherish their
 memories of Wayne Skidmore Condie of El Paso, who passed away on
 December 8, 2022, at the age of 69; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Lyman Wilson Condie and Mary Louise
 Skidmore, Wayne Condie was born in Salt Lake City, Utah, on
 June 3, 1953, and he grew up with the companionship of eight
 siblings; he graduated from Highland High School in 1971, and
 from 1972 to 1974, he served as a missionary in Japan; on October
 31, 1974, he met his future wife, Denise, and the couple
 exchanged wedding vows on September 18, 1975; they became the
 proud parents of four children, Heather, Jacob, Rachel, and
 Melissa, and they later welcomed seven grandchildren into their
 family; and
 WHEREAS, In 1978, Mr. Condie graduated from the University
 of Utah with a master's degree in business administration, and he
 went on to enjoy a rewarding career in the banking and finance
 industry; in retirement, he and his wife traveled the world,
 visiting 55 countries across 6 continents; his favorite leisure
 activities included watching college football, reading about
 history, and assembling jigsaw puzzles; above all else, he
 delighted in spending time with his family; and
 WHEREAS, Sustained by a deep faith, Mr. Condie was a
 devoted member of the Church of Jesus Christ, and he loved
 sharing the gospel with others; he gave generously of his time to
 teach at the local prison, and he also served as an instructor for
 the Pathway program, as a temple worker in Ciudad Juárez, Mexico,
 and as a volunteer with the church's employment resource
 services; and
 WHEREAS, Wayne Condie lived a rich and purposeful life
 centered around his faith and his family, and he will long be
 remembered with deep affection by all who knew him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Wayne Skidmore
 Condie and extend profound sympathy to the members of his family:
 to his wife, Lanea Denise Ford; to his children, Heather Allen
 and her husband, Clayton, Jacob Condie and his wife, Ali, Rachel
 Thoerig and her husband, David, and Melissa Dayley and her
 husband, Jason; to his grandchildren, Alexander, Kate, Joseph,
 Benjamin, Annabel, Kit, and Ian; and to his other relatives and
 many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Wayne Condie.
 Blanco
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 24, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate