House | 06/13/2023 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Senate Amendments distributed | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Senate passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 17 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 21 |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Ordered not printed | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Printing rule suspended | Journal Page: 21 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 18 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 18 | |
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 11 | |
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 10 | |
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 10 | |
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 8 | |
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 8 | |
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 7 | |
House | 05/31/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 19 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 8 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 12 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Record vote | RV#6 | Journal Page: 12 |
House | 05/30/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 12 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 12 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 9 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 9 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Amended | 1-Guillen | Journal Page: 9 |
House | 05/30/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 8 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 18 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Motion prevails | Journal Page: 6 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Motion to set as special order | Journal Page: 6 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 4 | |
House | 05/30/2023 | Filed |